KS HB2150 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - House Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - House Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting the carrying of concealed firearms in certain buildings.
Title
Prohibiting the carrying of concealed firearms in certain buildings.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-04 | House | House Died in Committee |
2017-02-02 | House | House Hearing: Thursday, February 02, 2017, 09:00 AM Room 346-S |
2017-01-25 | House | House Referred to Committee on Federal and State Affairs |
2017-01-25 | House | House Introduced |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://kslegislature.org/li/b2017_18/measures/hb2150/ |
Text | http://kslegislature.org/li/b2017_18/measures/documents/hb2150_00_0000.pdf |