KS HB2150 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - House Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - House Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Enacting the Kansas hope scholarship act.
Title
Enacting the Kansas hope scholarship act.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-21 | House | House Died in Committee |
2019-02-14 | House | House Hearing: Thursday, February 14, 2019, 3:30 PM Room 546-S |
2019-02-06 | House | House Referred to Committee on K-12 Education Budget |
2019-02-06 | House | House Introduced |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/hb2150/ |
Text | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/documents/hb2150_00_0000.pdf |