KS HB2154 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - Senate Died on Senate General Orders
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - Senate Died on Senate General Orders
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Senate Substitute for HB 2154 by Committee on Commerce - Amending employment security law with respect to benefit eligibility, contribution rates, shared work program requirements and other matters to address COVID-19 and to comply with federal COVID-19 employment security law emergency administrative grant and reimbursement funding requirements.
Title
Senate Substitute for HB 2154 by Committee on Commerce - Amending employment security law with respect to benefit eligibility, contribution rates, shared work program requirements and other matters to address COVID-19 and to comply with federal COVID-19 employment security law emergency administrative grant and reimbursement funding requirements.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-27 - House - House Final Action - Passed - Yea: 111 Nay: 12 (Y: 111 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - House - House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Burroughs was rejected - Yea: 45 Nay: 66 (Y: 45 N: 66 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [FAIL]
2019-03-26 - House - House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Burroughs was rejected - Yea: 45 Nay: 66 (Y: 45 N: 66 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-21 | Senate | Senate Died on Senate General Orders |
2020-05-21 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending substitute bill be passed by |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Commerce |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Senate Received and Introduced |
2019-03-27 | House | House Final Action - Passed; Yea: 111 Nay: 12 |
2019-03-26 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed |
2019-03-26 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Burroughs was rejected Yea: 45 Nay: 66 |
2019-03-26 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Burroughs |
2019-03-12 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Rural Revitalization |
2019-03-06 | House | House Withdrawn from Committee on Appropriations; Rereferred to Committee on Rural Revitalization |
2019-02-27 | House | House Withdrawn from Calendar; Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2019-02-19 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Rural Revitalization |
2019-02-18 | House | House Hearing: Monday, February 18, 2019, 9:00 AM Room 582-N |
2019-02-06 | House | House Referred to Committee on Rural Revitalization |
2019-02-06 | House | House Introduced |