KS HB2158 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-01 - House Approved by Governor on Tuesday, April 18, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-01 - House Approved by Governor on Tuesday, April 18, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Election law; write-in candidates; advance voting, including by mail; notice of change in voting place; information for campaign officer and political committee reports; filing locations for contribution reports preceding an election.
Title
Election law; write-in candidates; advance voting, including by mail; notice of change in voting place; information for campaign officer and political committee reports; filing locations for contribution reports preceding an election.
Sponsors
Rep. Vic Miller [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-06 - House - House Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 123 Nay: 1 (Y: 123 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 123 Nay: 2 (Y: 123 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 123 Nay: 2 (Y: 123 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-01 | House | House Approved by Governor on Tuesday, April 18, 2017 |
2017-05-01 | House | House Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, April 14, 2017 |
2017-04-07 | House | House Reengrossed on Friday, April 7, 2017 |
2017-04-06 | House | House Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 123 Nay: 1 |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 40 Nay: 0 |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Senate Conference committee report now available |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Senate Motion to accede adopted; Senator Bowers, Senator Fitzgerald and Senator Faust-Goudeau appointed as conferees |
2017-04-03 | House | House Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Representative Esau , Representative Carpenter and Representative Miller as conferees |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Senate Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 40 Nay: 0 |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed as further amended |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Faust-Goudeau was adopted |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Faust-Goudeau |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Ethics, Elections and Local Government |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Tuesday, March 21, 2017, 09:30 AM Room 142-S |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Ethics, Elections and Local Government |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Senate Received and Introduced |
2017-02-21 | House | House Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 123 Nay: 2 |
2017-02-21 | House | House Engrossed on Monday, February 20, 2017 |
2017-02-20 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2017-02-20 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Parker was adopted |
2017-02-20 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Parker |
2017-02-20 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2017-02-13 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Elections |
2017-02-08 | House | House Hearing: Wednesday, February 08, 2017, 01:30 PM Room 281-N |
2017-01-25 | House | House Referred to Committee on Elections |
2017-01-25 | House | House Introduced |