KS HB2159 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - House Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - House Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the board of regents on behalf of Kansas state university to sell certain real property in Saline county.
Title
Authorizing the board of regents on behalf of Kansas state university to sell certain real property in Saline county.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-21 | House | House Died in Committee |
2019-02-18 | House | House Hearing: Monday, February 18, 2019, 9:00 AM Room 112-N |
2019-02-06 | House | House Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2019-02-06 | House | House Introduced |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/hb2159/ |
Text | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/documents/hb2159_00_0000.pdf |