KS HB2177 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-01 - House Engrossed on Sunday, April 7, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-01 - House Engrossed on Sunday, April 7, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Updating accounting and reporting requirements of hedging transactions, risk-based capital instructions and enterprise risk reports and updating definitions for fraudulent insurance acts.
Title
Updating accounting and reporting requirements of hedging transactions, risk-based capital instructions and enterprise risk reports and updating definitions for fraudulent insurance acts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-05 - House - House Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 120 Nay: 1 (Y: 120 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 39 Nay: 0 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - House - House Final Action - Passed - Yea: 122 Nay: 2 (Y: 122 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 39 Nay: 0 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - House - House Final Action - Passed - Yea: 122 Nay: 2 (Y: 122 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-01 | House | House Engrossed on Sunday, April 7, 2019 |
2019-05-01 | House | House Approved by Governor on Thursday, April 18, 2019 |
2019-05-01 | House | House Enrolled and presented to Governor on Tuesday, April 9, 2019 |
2019-04-05 | House | House Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 120 Nay: 1 |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 40 Nay: 0 |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Senate Conference committee report now available |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Senate Motion to accede adopted; Senator Olson, Senator Billinger and Senator Ware appointed as conferees |
2019-04-01 | House | House Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Representative Vickrey , Representative Cox and Representative Neighbor as conferees |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Senate Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 39 Nay: 0 |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Financial Institutions and Insurance |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Wednesday, March 13, 2019, 9:30 AM Room 546-S |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Financial Institutions and Insurance |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Senate Received and Introduced |
2019-02-27 | House | House Final Action - Passed; Yea: 122 Nay: 2 |
2019-02-26 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed |
2019-02-21 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Insurance |
2019-02-18 | House | House Hearing: Monday, February 18, 2019, 3:30 PM Room 212-N |
2019-02-07 | House | House Referred to Committee on Insurance |
2019-02-07 | House | House Introduced |