KS HB2178 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Vetoed on February 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-22 - Senate Motion to override veto failed; Veto sustained; Yea: 24 Nay: 16
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on February 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-22 - Senate Motion to override veto failed; Veto sustained; Yea: 24 Nay: 16
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Substitute for HB 2178 - Concerning income taxation; relating to determination of Kansas adjusted gross income, rates, itemized deductions.
Title
Substitute for HB 2178 - Concerning income taxation; relating to determination of Kansas adjusted gross income, rates, itemized deductions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-22 - Senate - Senate Motion to override veto failed; Veto sustained - Yea: 24 Nay: 16 (Y: 24 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - House - House Motion to override veto prevailed - Yea: 85 Nay: 40 (Y: 85 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-17 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed - Yea: 22 Nay: 18 (Y: 22 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - House - House Final Action - Substitute passed - Yea: 76 Nay: 48 (Y: 76 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - House - House Committee of the Whole - Substitute bill be passed - Yea: 83 Nay: 39 (Y: 83 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - House - House Motion to override veto prevailed - Yea: 85 Nay: 40 (Y: 85 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-17 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed - Yea: 22 Nay: 18 (Y: 22 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - House - House Final Action - Substitute passed - Yea: 76 Nay: 48 (Y: 76 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - House - House Committee of the Whole - Substitute bill be passed - Yea: 83 Nay: 39 (Y: 83 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-22 | Senate | Senate Motion to override veto failed; Veto sustained; Yea: 24 Nay: 16 |
2017-02-22 | House | House Motion to override veto prevailed; Yea: 85 Nay: 40 |
2017-02-22 | House | House Vetoed by Governor; Returned to House on Wednesday, February 22, 2017 |
2017-02-21 | House | House Enrolled and presented to Governor on Tuesday, February 21, 2017 |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed; Yea: 22 Nay: 18 |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee of the Whole from the chair. |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Senate Received and Introduced |
2017-02-16 | House | House Final Action - Substitute passed; Yea: 76 Nay: 48 |
2017-02-15 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Substitute bill be passed Yea: 83 Nay: 39 |
2017-02-15 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted recommending substitute bill be passed |
2017-02-13 | House | House Committee Report recommending substitute bill be passed by Committee on Taxation |
2017-02-02 | House | House Hearing: Thursday, February 02, 2017, 03:30 PM Room 346-S |
2017-01-26 | House | House Referred to Committee on Taxation |
2017-01-26 | House | House Introduced |