KS HB2213 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-28 - House Stricken from Calendar by Rule 1507
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-28 - House Stricken from Calendar by Rule 1507
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Adding a definition of "amount involved" for a fraudulent insurance act.
Title
Adding a definition of "amount involved" for a fraudulent insurance act.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-28 | House | House Stricken from Calendar by Rule 1507 |
2019-02-26 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Insurance |
2019-02-25 | House | House Hearing: Monday, February 25, 2019, 3:30 PM Room 212-N |
2019-02-08 | House | House Referred to Committee on Insurance |
2019-02-08 | House | House Introduced |