KS HB2219 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - House Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - House Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring bodies subject to the Kansas open meetings act to record proceedings and make the recordings available to the public.
Title
Requiring bodies subject to the Kansas open meetings act to record proceedings and make the recordings available to the public.
Sponsors
Rep. John Alcala [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-21 | House | House Died in Committee |
2019-02-18 | House | House Hearing: Monday, February 18, 2019, 3:30 PM Room 346-S |
2019-02-08 | House | House Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2019-02-08 | House | House Introduced |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/hb2219/ |
Text | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/documents/hb2219_00_0000.pdf |