KS HB2237 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - House Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - House Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allow cities and counties to publish legal notices on the internet.
Title
Allow cities and counties to publish legal notices on the internet.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-21 | House | House Died in Committee |
2019-02-25 | House | House Hearing: Monday, February 25, 2019, 9:00 AM Room 218-N - CANCELED |
2019-02-12 | House | House Referred to Committee on Local Government |
2019-02-12 | House | House Introduced |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/hb2237/ |
Text | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/documents/hb2237_00_0000.pdf |