KS HB2286 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - House Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - House Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Making appropriations for FY 2020 for the Kansas state school for the deaf.
Title
Making appropriations for FY 2020 for the Kansas state school for the deaf.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-21 | House | House Died in Committee |
2019-03-19 | House | House Hearing: Tuesday, March 19, 2019, 9:00 AM Room 112-N |
2019-02-13 | House | House Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2019-02-13 | House | House Introduced |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/hb2286/ |
Text | http://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/documents/hb2286_00_0000.pdf |