KS HB2308 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - Senate Died in Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - Senate Died in Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Suicide evaluation upon admission to certain treatment facilities.
Title
Suicide evaluation upon admission to certain treatment facilities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-28 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 124 Nay: 0 (Y: 124 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-04 | Senate | Senate Died in Senate Committee |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Public Health and Welfare |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Senate Received and Introduced |
2018-03-28 | House | House Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 124 Nay: 0 |
2018-03-28 | House | House Reengrossed on Tuesday, March 27, 2018 |
2018-03-27 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2018-03-27 | House | House Motion to reconsider amendment by Representative Wheeler adopted. Upon reconsideration, motion to amend was rejected. |
2018-03-27 | House | House Engrossed on Monday, March 26, 2018 |
2018-03-26 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2018-03-26 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Wheeler was adopted |
2018-03-26 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Wheeler |
2018-03-26 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Weber was adopted |
2018-03-26 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Weber |
2018-03-26 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2018-03-14 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Federal and State Affairs |
2018-03-06 | House | House Hearing: Tuesday, March 06, 2018, 09:00 AM Room 346-S |
2018-02-14 | House | House Hearing: Wednesday, February 14, 2018, 09:00 AM Room 346-S - CANCELLED |
2017-03-29 | House | House Hearing: Wednesday, March 29, 2017, 09:00 AM Room 346-S - CANCELLED |
2017-03-27 | House | House Hearing: Monday, March 27, 2017, 09:00 AM Room 346-S - CANCELLED |
2017-03-21 | House | House Hearing: Tuesday, March 21, 2017, 09:00 AM Room 346-S - CANCELLED |
2017-02-08 | House | House Referred to Committee on Federal and State Affairs |
2017-02-08 | House | House Introduced |