KS HB2314 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - House Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - House Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing use of ad valorem taxes to pay for capital improvements within a redevelopment district encompassing a federal enclave; authorizing issuance of bonds.
Title
Authorizing use of ad valorem taxes to pay for capital improvements within a redevelopment district encompassing a federal enclave; authorizing issuance of bonds.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-04 | House | House Died in Committee |
2017-03-06 | House | House Hearing: Monday, March 06, 2017, 03:30 PM Room 346-S |
2017-02-08 | House | House Referred to Committee on Taxation |
2017-02-08 | House | House Introduced |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2017_18/measures/hb2314/ |
Text | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2017_18/measures/documents/hb2314_00_0000.pdf |