KS HB2315 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - House Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - House Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Income tax, rates, modifications, credits; cigarettes and tobacco products, rates; alcoholic beverages, liquor enforcement, rates; business entities, filing fees.
Title
Income tax, rates, modifications, credits; cigarettes and tobacco products, rates; alcoholic beverages, liquor enforcement, rates; business entities, filing fees.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-04 | House | House Died on Calendar |
2017-02-23 | House | House Committee Report, be amended without recommendation by Committee on Taxation |
2017-02-16 | House | House Hearing: Thursday, February 16, 2017, 03:30 PM Room 346-S |
2017-02-14 | House | House Hearing: Tuesday, February 14, 2017, 03:30 PM Room 346-S - CANCELLED |
2017-02-08 | House | House Referred to Committee on Taxation |
2017-02-08 | House | House Introduced |