KS HB2336 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - Senate Died in Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - Senate Died in Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Clarifying when offenders under supervision of the secretary of corrections are awarded jail credit.
Title
Clarifying when offenders under supervision of the secretary of corrections are awarded jail credit.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-27 - House - House Emergency Final Action - Passed - Yea: 124 Nay: 0 (Y: 124 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-21 | Senate | Senate Died in Senate Committee |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Wednesday, March 13, 2019, 10:30 AM Room 346-S |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Senate Received and Introduced |
2019-02-27 | House | House Emergency Final Action - Passed; Yea: 124 Nay: 0 |
2019-02-27 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed |
2019-02-25 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice |
2019-02-22 | House | House Hearing: Friday, February 22, 2019, 1:30 PM Room 152-S |
2019-02-14 | House | House Referred to Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice |
2019-02-14 | House | House Introduced |