KS HB2340 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - House Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - House Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Delaying distribution of certain property taxes paid under protest and requiring certain information on protested or exempt property taxes be provided to local taxing jurisdictions.
Title
Delaying distribution of certain property taxes paid under protest and requiring certain information on protested or exempt property taxes be provided to local taxing jurisdictions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-21 | House | House Died on Calendar |
2019-03-25 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Taxation |
2019-03-14 | House | House Hearing: Thursday, March 14, 2019, 3:30 PM Room 112-N |
2019-02-14 | House | House Referred to Committee on Taxation |
2019-02-14 | House | House Introduced |