KS HB2341 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - House Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - House Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Adding Cowley and Seward counties to the list of rural opportunity zones.
Title
Adding Cowley and Seward counties to the list of rural opportunity zones.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-04 | House | House Died on Calendar |
2017-03-17 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Taxation |
2017-02-20 | House | House Hearing: Monday, February 20, 2017, 03:30 PM Room 346-S |
2017-02-09 | House | House Referred to Committee on Taxation |
2017-02-09 | House | House Introduced |