KS HB2345 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - House Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - House Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Tax lid exception when budget was higher in prior five years.
Title
Tax lid exception when budget was higher in prior five years.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-21 | House | House Died on Calendar |
2019-03-22 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Taxation |
2019-03-06 | House | House Hearing: Wednesday, March 6, 2019, 3:30 PM Room 112-N |
2019-02-14 | House | House Referred to Committee on Taxation |
2019-02-14 | House | House Introduced |