KS HB2359 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - House Died in Conference
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - House Died in Conference
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Senate Substitute for Substitute for HB 2359 by Committee on Ways and Means - Appropriations for FY 2018, FY 2019 and FY 2020 for various state agencies; capital improvement projects; omnibus appropriation act.
Title
Senate Substitute for Substitute for HB 2359 by Committee on Ways and Means - Appropriations for FY 2018, FY 2019 and FY 2020 for various state agencies; capital improvement projects; omnibus appropriation act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-30 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 28 Nay: 12 (Y: 28 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-05 - House - House Final Action - Substitute passed - Yea: 115 Nay: 0 (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2018-03-05 - House - House Final Action - Substitute passed - Yea: 115 Nay: 0 (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-04 | House | House Died in Conference |
2018-04-30 | Senate | Senate Motion to accede adopted; Senator McGinn, Senator Billinger and Senator Kelly appointed as conferees |
2018-04-30 | House | House Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Representative Waymaster , Representative Proehl and Representative Wolfe Moore as conferees |
2018-04-30 | Senate | Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 28 Nay: 12 |
2018-04-30 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Substitute bill be passed as amended |
2018-04-30 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Taylor was adopted |
2018-04-30 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Taylor |
2018-04-30 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Rogers was adopted |
2018-04-30 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Rogers |
2018-04-30 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Pettey was adopted |
2018-04-30 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Pettey |
2018-04-30 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted recommending substitute bill be passed |
2018-04-30 | Senate | Senate Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted; |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending substitute bill be passed by Committee on Ways and Means |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Wednesday, March 21, 2018, 10:30 AM Room 548-S |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Tuesday, March 13, 2018, 10:30 AM Room 548-S - CANCELLED |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Senate Received and Introduced |
2018-03-05 | House | House Final Action - Substitute passed; Yea: 115 Nay: 0 |
2018-03-01 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Substitute bill be passed |
2018-03-01 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted recommending substitute bill be passed |
2018-02-15 | House | House Committee Report recommending substitute bill be passed by Committee on Government, Technology and Security |
2017-02-21 | House | House Withdrawn from Committee on Appropriations; Rereferred to Committee on Government, Technology and Security |
2017-02-20 | House | House Withdrawn from Committee on Government, Technology and Security; Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2017-02-15 | House | House Hearing: Wednesday, February 15, 2017, 09:00 AM Room 218-N |
2017-02-10 | House | House Referred to Committee on Government, Technology and Security |
2017-02-10 | House | House Introduced |