KS HB2361 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - Senate Died in Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - Senate Died in Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Transferring administration of the state workers compensation self-insurance fund to the department of administration.
Title
Transferring administration of the state workers compensation self-insurance fund to the department of administration.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-21 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 119 Nay: 3 (Y: 119 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - House - House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Hodge was rejected - Yea: 43 Nay: 75 (Y: 43 N: 75 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2018-02-20 - House - House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Curtis was rejected - Yea: 41 Nay: 77 (Y: 41 N: 77 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2018-02-20 - House - House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Hodge was rejected - Yea: 43 Nay: 75 (Y: 43 N: 75 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2018-02-20 - House - House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Curtis was rejected - Yea: 41 Nay: 77 (Y: 41 N: 77 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-04 | Senate | Senate Died in Senate Committee |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Senate Received and Introduced |
2018-02-21 | House | House Engrossed on Tuesday, February 20, 2018 |
2018-02-21 | House | House Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 119 Nay: 3 |
2018-02-20 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2018-02-20 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Hodge was rejected Yea: 43 Nay: 75 |
2018-02-20 | House | House Representative Neighbor raised a question of germaneness. The amendment was ruled germane. |
2018-02-20 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Hodge |
2018-02-20 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Curtis was rejected Yea: 41 Nay: 77 |
2018-02-20 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Curtis |
2018-02-20 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2018-01-22 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on General Government Budget |
2017-03-24 | House | House Hearing: Friday, March 24, 2017, 01:30 PM Room 218-N |
2017-03-23 | House | House Withdrawn from Committee on Appropriations; Referred to Committee on General Government Budget |
2017-02-13 | House | House Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2017-02-13 | House | House Introduced |