KS HB2371 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - Senate Died in Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - Senate Died in Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Providing for an increase in permit fees for oversize or overweight vehicles and requiring registration for escort vehicle service operators.
Title
Providing for an increase in permit fees for oversize or overweight vehicles and requiring registration for escort vehicle service operators.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-27 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 102 Nay: 22 (Y: 102 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-21 | Senate | Senate Died in Senate Committee |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Senate Received and Introduced |
2019-03-27 | House | House Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 102 Nay: 22 |
2019-03-27 | House | House Engrossed on Tuesday, March 26, 2019 |
2019-03-26 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2019-03-26 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2019-03-25 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Taxation |
2019-03-14 | House | House Hearing: Thursday, March 14, 2019, 3:30 PM Room 112-N |
2019-02-18 | House | House Referred to Committee on Taxation |
2019-02-18 | House | House Introduced |