KS HB2372 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - Senate Died in Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - Senate Died in Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Providing for an increase in registration fees for electric and hybrid vehicles.
Title
Providing for an increase in registration fees for electric and hybrid vehicles.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-27 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 73 Nay: 51 (Y: 73 N: 51 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-21 | Senate | Senate Died in Senate Committee |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Senate Received and Introduced |
2019-03-27 | House | House Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 73 Nay: 51 |
2019-03-27 | House | House Engrossed on Tuesday, March 26, 2019 |
2019-03-26 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2019-03-26 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2019-03-25 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Taxation |
2019-03-14 | House | House Hearing: Thursday, March 14, 2019, 3:30 PM Room 112-N |
2019-02-18 | House | House Referred to Committee on Taxation |
2019-02-18 | House | House Introduced |