KS HB2383 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - House Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - House Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amendments regarding the licensure and regulation of barbering.
Title
Amendments regarding the licensure and regulation of barbering.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-25 - House - House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Highberger was rejected - Yea: 58 Nay: 61 (Y: 58 N: 61 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-21 | House | House Died on Calendar |
2019-03-25 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Motion to recommend favorably for passage failed |
2019-03-25 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Highberger was rejected Yea: 58 Nay: 61 |
2019-03-25 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Handwritten Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Highberger |
2019-03-25 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2019-03-22 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on General Government Budget |
2019-03-19 | House | House Hearing: Tuesday, March 19, 2019, 3:30 PM Room 281-N |
2019-03-15 | House | House Withdrawn from Committee on Appropriations; Referred to Committee on General Government Budget |
2019-02-20 | House | House Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2019-02-20 | House | House Introduced |