KS HB2388 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - House Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - House Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Extending the length of time for the Kansas corporation NOL carryforward.
Title
Extending the length of time for the Kansas corporation NOL carryforward.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-21 | House | House Died on Calendar |
2019-03-25 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Taxation |
2019-03-18 | House | House Hearing: Monday, March 18, 2019, 3:30 PM Room 112-N |
2019-02-27 | House | House Referred to Committee on Taxation |
2019-02-27 | House | House Introduced |