KS HB2402 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - Senate Died in Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - Senate Died in Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing certain business entities to hire physicians and chiropractors.
Title
Authorizing certain business entities to hire physicians and chiropractors.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-27 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 106 Nay: 18 (Y: 106 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-21 | Senate | Senate Died in Senate Committee |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Public Health and Welfare |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Senate Received and Introduced |
2019-03-27 | House | House Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 106 Nay: 18 |
2019-03-26 | House | House Engrossed on Tuesday, March 26, 2019 |
2019-03-26 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2019-03-25 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Health and Human Services |
2019-03-22 | House | House Hearing continuation: Friday, March 22, 2019, 11:00 AM Room 546-S |
2019-03-21 | House | House Hearing continuation: Thursday, March 21, 2019, 1:30 PM Room 546-S |
2019-03-21 | House | House Hearing: (proponents) Thursday, March 21, 2019, 1:30 PM Room 546-S |
2019-03-21 | House | House Hearing: (opponents) Thursday, March 21, 2019, 1:30 PM Room 546-S |
2019-03-21 | House | House Hearing: (neutral) Thursday, March 21, 2019, 1:30 PM Room 546-S |
2019-03-20 | House | House Hearing: Wednesday, March 20, 2019, 1:30 PM Room 546-S |
2019-03-20 | House | House Hearing: (proponents) Wednesday, March 20, 2019, 1:30 PM Room 546-S |
2019-03-20 | House | House Hearing: (opponents) Wednesday, March 20, 2019, 1:30 PM Room 546-S |
2019-03-19 | House | House Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services |
2019-03-19 | House | House Introduced |