KS HB2410 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - Senate Died in Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - Senate Died in Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Substitute for HB 2410 by Committee on K-12 Education Budget - Creating the Kansas school equity and enhancement act.
Title
Substitute for HB 2410 by Committee on K-12 Education Budget - Creating the Kansas school equity and enhancement act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-25 - House - House Final Action - Substitute passed as amended - Yea: 84 Nay: 39 (Y: 84 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - House - House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Ousley was rejected - Yea: 46 Nay: 73 (Y: 46 N: 73 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2017-05-24 - House - House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Trimmer was rejected - Yea: 47 Nay: 75 (Y: 47 N: 75 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2017-05-24 - House - House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Ousley was rejected - Yea: 46 Nay: 73 (Y: 46 N: 73 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2017-05-24 - House - House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Trimmer was rejected - Yea: 47 Nay: 75 (Y: 47 N: 75 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-04 | Senate | Senate Died in Senate Committee |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Senate Referred to Senate Select Committee on Education Finance |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Senate Received and Introduced |
2017-05-25 | House | House Final Action - Substitute passed as amended; Yea: 84 Nay: 39 |
2017-05-25 | House | House Engrossed on Wednesday, May 24, 2017 |
2017-05-24 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Substitute bill be passed as amended |
2017-05-24 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Ousley was rejected Yea: 46 Nay: 73 |
2017-05-24 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Ousley |
2017-05-24 | House | House Representative Ward raised a question of germaneness. The amendment was ruled not germane. |
2017-05-24 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Whitmer |
2017-05-24 | House | House Representative Hawkins raised a question of germaneness. The amendment was ruled not germane. |
2017-05-24 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Stogsdill |
2017-05-24 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Clark was adopted |
2017-05-24 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Clark |
2017-05-24 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Sutton was rejected |
2017-05-24 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Sutton |
2017-05-24 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Sutton was rejected |
2017-05-24 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Sutton |
2017-05-24 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Ruling of the chair was sustained |
2017-05-24 | House | House Representative Jennings raised a question of germaneness. The amendment was ruled not germane. |
2017-05-24 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Jacobs |
2017-05-24 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Highland was rejected |
2017-05-24 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Highland |
2017-05-24 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Trimmer was rejected Yea: 47 Nay: 75 |
2017-05-24 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Trimmer |
2017-05-24 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Representative Trimmer Amendment Part 5 Adopted. vote_tally |
2017-05-24 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Representative Trimmer Amendment Part 4 Failed. vote_tally |
2017-05-24 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Representative Trimmer Amendment Part 3 Adopted. vote_tally |
2017-05-24 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Representative Trimmer Amendment Part 2 Adopted. vote_tally |
2017-05-24 | House | House Part 1 not considered due to objection under House Rule 2109 regarding duplicate motions to amend. |
2017-05-24 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Representative Campbell requested the motion to amend by Representative Trimmer be divided. The amendment was ruled divisible and divided into 5 parts. |
2017-05-24 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Trimmer |
2017-05-24 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Aurand was adopted |
2017-05-24 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Aurand |
2017-05-24 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Campbell was adopted |
2017-05-24 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Campbell |
2017-05-24 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2017-05-24 | House | House Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted; |
2017-05-16 | House | House Committee Report, substitute bill without recommendation by Committee on K-12 Education Budget. |
2017-05-16 | House | House Committee Report, substitute bill without recommendation by Committee on K-12 Education Budget |
2017-05-12 | House | House Hearing: Friday, May 12, 2017, 10:30 AM Room 346-S |
2017-03-24 | House | House Hearing continuation: Friday, March 24, 2017, 01:30 PM Room 346-S |
2017-03-23 | House | House Hearing: Thursday, March 23, 2017, 01:30 PM Room 346-S |
2017-03-22 | House | House Referred to Committee on K-12 Education Budget |
2017-03-22 | House | House Introduced |