KS HB2439 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Passed on March 9 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-09 - House Approved by Governor on Friday, March 9, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Passed on March 9 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-09 - House Approved by Governor on Friday, March 9, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Creating an additional crime of involuntary manslaughter for certain violations of driving under the influence of alcohol or drugs.
Title
Creating an additional crime of involuntary manslaughter for certain violations of driving under the influence of alcohol or drugs.
Sponsors
Rep. Russell Jennings [R] | Rep. Shelee Brim [R] | Rep. Leo Delperdang [R] | Rep. Leonard Mastroni [R] |
Rep. Ron Ryckman [R] | Rep. Scott Schwab [R] | Rep. Eric Smith [R] | Rep. Sean Tarwater [R] |
Rep. John Wheeler [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-22 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed - Yea: 39 Nay: 0 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 122 Nay: 0 (Y: 122 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 122 Nay: 0 (Y: 122 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-09 | House | House Approved by Governor on Friday, March 9, 2018 |
2018-03-02 | House | House Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, March 02, 2018 |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Senate Final Action - Passed; Yea: 39 Nay: 0 |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed by |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Tuesday, February 06, 2018, 10:30 AM Room 346-S |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2018-01-30 | House | House Engrossed on Friday, January 26, 2018 |
2018-01-29 | Senate | Senate Received and Introduced |
2018-01-29 | House | House Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 122 Nay: 0 |
2018-01-26 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2018-01-26 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Jennings was adopted |
2018-01-26 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Jennings |
2018-01-26 | House | House Representative Jennings raised a question of germaneness. The amendment was ruled not germane. |
2018-01-26 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Hodge |
2018-01-26 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2018-01-25 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice |
2018-01-10 | House | House Hearing: Thursday, January 18, 2018, 01:30 PM Room 152-S |
2018-01-18 | House | House Hearing: Thursday, January 18, 2018, 01:30 PM Room 152-S |
2018-01-08 | House | House Referred to Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice |
2018-01-08 | House | House Introduced |
2018-01-08 | House | House Prefiled for Introduction on Thursday, December 21, 2017 |