KS HB2465 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - Senate Died on Senate General Orders
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - Senate Died on Senate General Orders
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Designating Kansas commission on veterans affairs office employees as safety sensitive positions subject to drug screening.
Title
Designating Kansas commission on veterans affairs office employees as safety sensitive positions subject to drug screening.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-20 - House - House Final Action - Passed - Yea: 101 Nay: 17 (Y: 101 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-04 | Senate | Senate Died on Senate General Orders |
2018-03-16 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Federal and State Affairs |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Wednesday, March 14, 2018, 10:30 AM Room 144-S |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Federal and State Affairs |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Senate Received and Introduced |
2018-02-20 | House | House Final Action - Passed; Yea: 101 Nay: 17 |
2018-02-19 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed |
2018-02-05 | House | House Withdrawn from Consent Calendar and placed on General Orders |
2018-02-01 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed and placed on Consent Calendar by |
2018-01-25 | House | House Hearing: Thursday, January 25, 2018, 09:00 AM Room 152-S |
2018-01-11 | House | House Referred to Committee on Veterans and Military |
2018-01-11 | House | House Introduced |