KS HB2489 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - Senate Died in Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - Senate Died in Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Apportionment of corporate income under the multistate tax compact; election.
Title
Apportionment of corporate income under the multistate tax compact; election.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-16 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 110 Nay: 8 (Y: 110 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-04 | Senate | Senate Died in Senate Committee |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Assessment and Taxation |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Senate Received and Introduced |
2018-03-16 | House | House Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 110 Nay: 8 |
2018-03-16 | House | House Engrossed on Thursday, March 15, 2018 |
2018-03-15 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2018-03-15 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2018-03-08 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Taxation |
2018-02-08 | House | House Hearing: Thursday, February 08, 2018, 03:30 PM Room 346-S |
2018-02-07 | House | House Hearing: Wednesday, February 07, 2018, 03:30 PM Room 346-S - CANCELLED |
2018-01-17 | House | House Referred to Committee on Taxation |
2018-01-17 | House | House Introduced |