KS HB2549 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - House Approved by Governor on Tuesday, May 8, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - House Approved by Governor on Tuesday, May 8, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Judicial determinations of defendant's competency and commitment for treatment.
Title
Judicial determinations of defendant's competency and commitment for treatment.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-01 - House - House Concurred with amendments in conference - Yea: 122 Nay: 0 (Y: 122 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-03-28 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - House - House Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 117 Nay: 0 (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-28 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - House - House Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 117 Nay: 0 (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-04 | House | House Approved by Governor on Tuesday, May 8, 2018 |
2018-05-04 | House | House Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, May 04, 2018 |
2018-05-02 | House | House Reengrossed on Wednesday, May 2, 2018 |
2018-05-01 | House | House Concurred with amendments in conference; Yea: 122 Nay: 0 |
2018-05-01 | House | House Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted; |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Senate Motion to accede adopted; Senator V. Schmidt, Senator Bollier and Senator Kelly appointed as conferees |
2018-03-29 | House | House Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Representative Finch , Representative Ralph and Representative Carmichael as conferees |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Senate Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 40 Nay: 0 |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Public Health and Welfare |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Tuesday, March 06, 2018, 09:30 AM Room 118-N |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Public Health and Welfare |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Senate Received and Introduced |
2018-02-28 | House | House Engrossed on Friday, February 23, 2018 |
2018-02-22 | House | House Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 117 Nay: 0 |
2018-02-22 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2018-02-22 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2018-02-20 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Health and Human Services |
2018-02-07 | House | House Hearing: Wednesday, February 07, 2018, 01:30 PM Room 546-S |
2018-01-29 | House | House Withdrawn from Committee on Judiciary; Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services |
2018-01-25 | House | House Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2018-01-25 | House | House Introduced |