KS HB2563 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - House Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - House Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring broadband providers to contribute to the Kansas universal service fund and authorizing disbursements from such fund to promote broadband development.
Title
Requiring broadband providers to contribute to the Kansas universal service fund and authorizing disbursements from such fund to promote broadband development.
Sponsors
Rep. Tom Sloan [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-04 | House | House Died in Committee |
2018-02-05 | House | House Hearing: Monday, February 05, 2018, 09:00 AM Room 582-N |
2018-01-29 | House | House Referred to Committee on Energy, Utilities and Telecommunications |
2018-01-29 | House | House Introduced |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2017_18/measures/hb2563/ |
Text | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2017_18/measures/documents/hb2563_00_0000.pdf |