KS HB2704 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-3)
Status: Failed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - House Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-3)
Status: Failed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - House Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring written informed consent before administering an antipsychotic medication to an adult care home resident.
Title
Requiring written informed consent before administering an antipsychotic medication to an adult care home resident.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-04 | House | House Died in Committee |
2018-03-20 | House | House Hearing: Tuesday, March 20, 2018, 09:00 AM Room 218-N |
2018-03-15 | House | House Hearing: Thursday, March 15, 2018, 09:00 AM Room 218-N - CANCELLED |
2018-02-16 | House | House Withdrawn from Committee on Appropriations; Rereferred to Committee on Children and Seniors |
2018-02-15 | House | House Withdrawn from Committee on Children and Seniors; Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2018-02-15 | House | House Hearing: Thursday, February 15, 2018, 09:00 AM Room 218-N |
2018-02-07 | House | House Referred to Committee on Children and Seniors |
2018-02-07 | House | House Introduced |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2017_18/measures/hb2704/ |
Text | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2017_18/measures/documents/hb2704_00_0000.pdf |