KS HB2739 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - Senate Died in Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - Senate Died in Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Substitute for HB 2739 by Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice - Including relations between law enforcement and those interacting with law enforcement in the crime of unlawful sexual relations; increasing criminal penalty for lewd and lascivious behavior.
Title
Substitute for HB 2739 by Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice - Including relations between law enforcement and those interacting with law enforcement in the crime of unlawful sexual relations; increasing criminal penalty for lewd and lascivious behavior.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-27 - House - House Final Action - Substitute passed - Yea: 124 Nay: 0 (Y: 124 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-04 | Senate | Senate Died in Senate Committee |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Senate Received and Introduced |
2018-03-27 | House | House Final Action - Substitute passed; Yea: 124 Nay: 0 |
2018-03-27 | House | House Engrossed on Monday, March 26, 2018 |
2018-03-26 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Substitute bill be passed |
2018-03-26 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted recommending substitute bill be passed |
2018-03-22 | House | House Committee Report recommending substitute bill be passed by Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice |
2018-02-28 | House | House Hearing: Wednesday, February 28, 2018, 01:30 PM Room 152-S |
2018-02-19 | House | House Withdrawn from Committee on Appropriations; Rereferred to Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice |
2018-02-15 | House | House Withdrawn from Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice; Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2018-02-14 | House | House Hearing: Wednesday, February 14, 2018, 01:30 PM Room 152-S |
2018-02-09 | House | House Referred to Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice |
2018-02-09 | House | House Introduced |