KS HB2753 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - Senate Died in Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - Senate Died in Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Review of tax credits, tax exemptions and economic development programs.
Title
Review of tax credits, tax exemptions and economic development programs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-03 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 123 Nay: 0 (Y: 123 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-04 | Senate | Senate Died in Senate Committee |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Assessment and Taxation |
2018-04-03 | Senate | Senate Received and Introduced |
2018-04-03 | House | House Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 123 Nay: 0 |
2018-04-02 | House | House Engrossed on Monday, April 2, 2018 |
2018-04-02 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2018-04-02 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2018-03-27 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Passed over and retain a place on the calendar |
2018-03-27 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2018-03-08 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Taxation |
2018-03-05 | House | House Hearing: Monday, March 05, 2018, 03:30 PM Room 346-S |
2018-02-20 | House | House Referred to Committee on Taxation |
2018-02-20 | House | House Introduced |