KS HCR5002 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on January 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-24 - House Enrolled and presented to Secretary of State on Thursday, January 24, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on January 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-24 - House Enrolled and presented to Secretary of State on Thursday, January 24, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Joint session of the House of Representative and Senate to hear message of the Governor.
Title
Joint session of the House of Representative and Senate to hear message of the Governor.
Sponsors
Rep. Ron Ryckman [R] | Rep. Dan Hawkins [R] | Rep. Tom Sawyer [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-24 | House | House Enrolled and presented to Secretary of State on Thursday, January 24, 2019 |
2019-01-15 | Senate | Senate Adopted without roll call |
2019-01-15 | Senate | Senate Received and Introduced |
2019-01-14 | House | House Adopted without roll call |
2019-01-14 | House | House Introduced |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/hcr5002/ |
Text | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/documents/hcr5002_enrolled.pdf |