KS HR6005 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on January 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-01-27 - House Enrolled on Friday, January 27, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on January 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-01-27 - House Enrolled on Friday, January 27, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Congratulating and commending the members of the 2017 Kansas Teacher of the Year team.
Title
Congratulating and commending the members of the 2017 Kansas Teacher of the Year team.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-01-27 | House | House Enrolled on Friday, January 27, 2017 |
2017-01-26 | House | House Engrossed on Wednesday, January 25, 2017 |
2017-01-24 | House | House Adopted without roll call |
2017-01-23 | House | House Introduced |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2017_18/measures/hr6005/ |
Text | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2017_18/measures/documents/hr6005_enrolled.pdf |