KS HR6007 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-13 - House Enrolled on Monday, February 13, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-13 - House Enrolled on Monday, February 13, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Congratulating and commending Crysta Baier's fourth grade class at Edgerton Elementary and KC Healthy Kids on their efforts to support healthy kids and healthy communities through I Am Here.
Title
Congratulating and commending Crysta Baier's fourth grade class at Edgerton Elementary and KC Healthy Kids on their efforts to support healthy kids and healthy communities through I Am Here.
Sponsors
Rep. Bill Sutton [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-13 | House | House Enrolled on Monday, February 13, 2017 |
2017-02-10 | House | House Engrossed on Thursday, February 9, 2017 |
2017-02-09 | House | House Adopted without roll call |
2017-02-06 | House | House Introduced |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2017_18/measures/hr6007/ |
Text | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2017_18/measures/documents/hr6007_enrolled.pdf |