KS HR6013 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 53-15)
Status: Passed on March 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-22 - House Enrolled on Friday, March 22, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A resolution strengthening the sister-state relations between Kansas and Taiwan.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A resolution strengthening the sister-state relations between Kansas and Taiwan.

Sponsors

Rep. Les Mason [R]Rep. John Alcala [D]Rep. Tory Arnberger [R]Rep. Emil Bergquist [R]
Rep. Douglas Blex [R]Rep. Jesse Burris [R]Rep. Michael Capps [R]Rep. Sydney Carlin [D]
Rep. Blake Carpenter [R]Rep. Will Carpenter [R]Rep. Stephanie Clayton [R]Rep. Kenneth Collins [R]
Rep. Tom Cox [R]Rep. Chris Croft [R]Rep. Pam Curtis [D]Rep. Brenda Dietrich [R]
Rep. Ronald Ellis [R]Rep. John Eplee [R]Rep. Renee Erickson [R]Rep. Blaine Finch [R]
Rep. Gail Finney [D]Rep. Shannon Francis [R]Rep. David French [R]Rep. Randy Garber [R]
Rep. Jim Gartner [D]Rep. Dan Hawkins [R]Rep. Cheryl Helmer [R]Rep. Ron Highland [R]
Rep. Don Hineman [R]Rep. Kyle Hoffman [R]Rep. Nick Hoheisel [R]Rep. Steven Huebert [R]
Rep. Susan Humphries [R]Rep. Trevor Jacobs [R]Rep. Russell Jennings [R]Rep. Steven Johnson [R]
Rep. Jim Kelly [R]Rep. Jan Kessinger [R]Rep. Annie Kuether [D]Rep. Nancy Lusk [D]
Rep. Cindy Neighbor [D]Rep. KC Ohaebosim [D]Rep. Stephen Owens [R]Rep. Fred Patton [R]
Rep. Tom Phillips [R]Rep. Jason Probst [D]Rep. Richard Proehl [R]Rep. Ken Rahjes [R]
Rep. Bradley Ralph [R]Rep. John Resman [R]Rep. Bill Rhiley [R]Rep. Louis Ruiz [D]
Rep. Mark Samsel [R]Rep. Mark Schreiber [R]Rep. Joe Seiwert [R]Rep. Eric Smith [R]
Rep. Jerry Stogsdill [D]Rep. Bill Sutton [R]Rep. Sean Tarwater [R]Rep. Adam Thomas [R]
Rep. Jene Vickrey [R]Rep. Paul Waggoner [R]Rep. Freda Warfield [D]Rep. Barbara Wasinger [R]
Rep. Troy Waymaster [R]Rep. Virgil Weigel [D]Rep. Kristey Williams [R]Rep. Brandon Woodard [D]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-22HouseHouse Enrolled on Friday, March 22, 2019
2019-03-20HouseHouse Adopted without roll call
2019-03-06HouseHouse Introduced

Kansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback