KS HR6016 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 7 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-07 - House Enrolled on Thursday, March 07, 2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 7 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-07 - House Enrolled on Thursday, March 07, 2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Honoring the life of Jim Weaver.
Title
Honoring the life of Jim Weaver.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-07 | House | House Enrolled on Thursday, March 07, 2013 |
2013-02-28 | House | House Adopted without roll call |
2013-02-20 | House | House Introduced |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.kslegislature.org/li/b2013_14/measures/hr6016/ |
Text | http://www.kslegislature.org/li/b2013_14/measures/documents/hr6016_enrolled.pdf |