KS HR6016 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 17 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-17 - House Enrolled on Tuesday, March 17, 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 17 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-17 - House Enrolled on Tuesday, March 17, 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Designating March 11, 2015, as Kansas Lupus Awareness Day.
Title
Designating March 11, 2015, as Kansas Lupus Awareness Day.
Sponsors
Rep. Gail Finney [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-17 | House | House Enrolled on Tuesday, March 17, 2015 |
2015-03-11 | House | House Adopted without roll call |
2015-03-11 | House | House Introduced |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.kslegislature.org/li/b2015_16/measures/hr6016/ |
Text | http://www.kslegislature.org/li/b2015_16/measures/documents/hr6016_enrolled.pdf |