KS HR6016 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 18-2)
Status: Passed on May 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-01 - House Enrolled on Thursday, April 13, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Recognizing that pornography is a public health hazard leading to a broad spectrum of individual and public health impacts and societal harms.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Recognizing that pornography is a public health hazard leading to a broad spectrum of individual and public health impacts and societal harms.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-30 - House - House Final Action - Adopted - Yea: 123 Nay: 1 (Y: 123 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-01HouseHouse Enrolled on Thursday, April 13, 2017
2017-03-30HouseHouse Final Action - Adopted; Yea: 123 Nay: 1
2017-03-29HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Be adopted
2017-03-23HouseHouse Committee Report recommending resolution be adopted by
2017-03-13HouseHouse Hearing: Thursday, March 16, 2017, 09:00 AM Room 346-S
2017-03-08HouseHouse Referred to Committee on Federal and State Affairs
2017-03-08HouseHouse Introduced

Kansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback