KS HR6017 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-15 - House Enrolled on Wednesday, March 15, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-15 - House Enrolled on Wednesday, March 15, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Recognizing after-school programs in Kansas and the increased exposure to Science, Technology, Engineering and Math (STEM) they provide to K-12 youth.
Title
Recognizing after-school programs in Kansas and the increased exposure to Science, Technology, Engineering and Math (STEM) they provide to K-12 youth.
Sponsors
Rep. John Wilson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-15 | House | House Enrolled on Wednesday, March 15, 2017 |
2017-03-09 | House | House Adopted without roll call |
2017-03-08 | House | House Introduced |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2017_18/measures/hr6017/ |
Text | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2017_18/measures/documents/hr6017_enrolled.pdf |