KS HR6023 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 84-41)
Status: Passed on March 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-21 - House Enrolled on Tuesday, March 21, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 84-41)
Status: Passed on March 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-21 - House Enrolled on Tuesday, March 21, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Honoring the life of Srinivas Kuchibhotla and recognizing a united community and state.
Title
Honoring the life of Srinivas Kuchibhotla and recognizing a united community and state.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-21 | House | House Enrolled on Tuesday, March 21, 2017 |
2017-03-16 | House | House Adopted without roll call |
2017-03-15 | House | House Introduced |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2017_18/measures/hr6023/ |
Text | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2017_18/measures/documents/hr6023_enrolled.pdf |