KS HR6038 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on January 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-01-11 - House Enrolled on Thursday, January 11, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on January 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-01-11 - House Enrolled on Thursday, January 11, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Organization of the House of Representatives, 2018.
Title
Organization of the House of Representatives, 2018.
Sponsors
Rep. Ron Ryckman [R] | Rep. Don Hineman [R] | Rep. Jim Ward [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-11 | House | House Enrolled on Thursday, January 11, 2018 |
2018-01-09 | House | House Engrossed on Monday, January 8, 2018 |
2018-01-08 | House | House Adopted without roll call |
2018-01-08 | House | House Introduced |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2017_18/measures/hr6038/ |
Text | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2017_18/measures/documents/hr6038_enrolled.pdf |