KS HR6054 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-06 - House Enrolled on Friday, April 06, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-06 - House Enrolled on Friday, April 06, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Congratulating and commending the Pittsburg State University men's indoor track and field team on their 2018 NCAA Division II national championship.
Title
Congratulating and commending the Pittsburg State University men's indoor track and field team on their 2018 NCAA Division II national championship.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-06 | House | House Enrolled on Friday, April 06, 2018 |
2018-04-05 | House | House Adopted without roll call |
2018-03-26 | House | House Introduced |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2017_18/measures/hr6054/ |
Text | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2017_18/measures/documents/hr6054_enrolled.pdf |