KS HR6055 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-02 - House Enrolled on Monday, April 02, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-02 - House Enrolled on Monday, April 02, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Urging the small business community in Kansas to assist in developing a model for saving for retirement that can be accessible to working Kansans.
Title
Urging the small business community in Kansas to assist in developing a model for saving for retirement that can be accessible to working Kansans.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-02 | House | House Enrolled on Monday, April 02, 2018 |
2018-03-28 | House | House Adopted without roll call |
2018-03-26 | House | House Introduced |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2017_18/measures/hr6055/ |
Text | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2017_18/measures/documents/hr6055_enrolled.pdf |