KS SB1 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - Senate Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - Senate Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring state general fund moneys to fund school district transportation weightings, not state highway fund moneys; making and concerning appropriations for the department of education and the department of transportation for FY 2019.
Title
Requiring state general fund moneys to fund school district transportation weightings, not state highway fund moneys; making and concerning appropriations for the department of education and the department of transportation for FY 2019.
Sponsors
Sen. Jim Denning [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-21 | Senate | Senate Died in Committee |
2019-01-15 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2019-01-14 | Senate | Senate Introduced |
2019-01-14 | Senate | Senate Prefiled for Introduction on Wednesday, November 7, 2018 |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/sb1/ |
Text | http://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/documents/sb1_00_0000.pdf |