KS SB108 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - House Died in House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - House Died in House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Increasing criminal penalties for abuse of a child and involuntary manslaughter when the victim is under 6 years of age and exempting certain victims from being considered an aggressor or participant as a mitigating factor when considering a departure sentence.
Title
Increasing criminal penalties for abuse of a child and involuntary manslaughter when the victim is under 6 years of age and exempting certain victims from being considered an aggressor or participant as a mitigating factor when considering a departure sentence.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-27 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 39 Nay: 0 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-21 | House | House Died in House Committee |
2019-04-01 | House | House Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2019-04-01 | House | House Received and Introduced |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 39 Nay: 0 |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed as further amended |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Miller was adopted |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Miller |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Passed over and retain a place on the calendar |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Senate Withdrawn from Committee on Ways and Means and referred to Committee of the Whole |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Senate Withdrawn from Calendar, Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Judiciary |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Tuesday, February 19, 2019, 10:30 AM Room 346-S |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Senate Introduced |