KS SB111 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - Senate Died on General Orders
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - Senate Died on General Orders
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Substitute for SB 111 by Committee on Assessment and Taxation - Requiring certain remote sellers to collect Kansas sales tax.
Title
Substitute for SB 111 by Committee on Assessment and Taxation - Requiring certain remote sellers to collect Kansas sales tax.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-04 | Senate | Senate Died on General Orders |
2018-04-03 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending substitute bill be passed by Committee on Assessment and Taxation |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Senate Withdrawn from Calendar, Rereferred to Committee on Assessment and Taxation |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Assessment and Taxation |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Wednesday, February 08, 2017, 09:30 AM Room 548-S |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Assessment and Taxation |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Senate Introduced |