KS SB12 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - Senate Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - Senate Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amending residency restrictions for persons on transitional or conditional release under the Kansas sexually violent predator act.
Title
Amending residency restrictions for persons on transitional or conditional release under the Kansas sexually violent predator act.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-04 | Senate | Senate Died in Committee |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Senate Withdrawn from Calendar, Rereferred to Committee on Judiciary |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Judiciary |
2017-01-26 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Thursday, January 26, 2017, 10:30 AM Room 346-S |
2017-01-12 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2017-01-11 | Senate | Senate Introduced |